THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:42:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 462
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 977-5991
Fax: (519) 968-9709

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 14 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elsdon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Elsdon (CPSO#: 52669 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 462
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 977-5991
Fax: (519) 968-9709

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 14 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elsdon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Elsdon (CPSO#: 52669 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS CAMPBELL ELSDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELSDON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS CAMPBELL ELSDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELSDON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1983