THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:48:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 789-2311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Hill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hill (CPSO#: 52677 )
Business Address: 8 - 100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
(705) 789-2311

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 789-2311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Hill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hill (CPSO#: 52677 )
Business Address: 8 - 100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
(705) 789-2311

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN DONALD HILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN DONALD HILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1983