THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:15:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Neurosciences
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 973-8771
Fax: (519) 973-4690

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 01 Sep 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dante Morassutti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Morassutti (CPSO#: 52699 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital - Ouellette Campus
Department of Surgery
Division of Neurosurgery
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
5195666465

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Neurosciences
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 973-8771
Fax: (519) 973-4690

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 01 Sep 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dante Morassutti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Morassutti (CPSO#: 52699 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital - Ouellette Campus
Department of Surgery
Division of Neurosurgery
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
5195666465

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANTE JOSEPH MORASSUTTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORASSUTTI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANTE JOSEPH MORASSUTTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORASSUTTI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 2007
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 25 Oct 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 May 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 1999

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983