THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:09:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Doctors Office
Royal Bank Plaza Medical Centre
PO Box 134
200 Bay St., Unit LR8
Toronto Ontario M5J 2J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 368-6787
Fax: (416) 368-7632
Address: Kipling Heights Medical Centre
2291 Kipling Ave.
Rexdale Ontario M9W 4L6
Phone: 416 741 4545
Fax: 416 744 1484
Address: 1252 Lawrence Avenue East
Victoria Medical Group
Toronto Ontario M3A 1C3
Phone: 416 609 1100
Fax: 416 609 1102
Address: Toronto Health Centre
45 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M4H 1C3
Phone: (416) 696-9836
Extension: 333
Fax: 416 696 8080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 19 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 02 Dec 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Walter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Walter (CPSO#: 52700 )
Business Address: 45 Overlea Boulevard
Suite A6
Toronto Ontario M4H 1C3
(416) 696-9836
Business Address: The Doctors Office
Royal Bank Plaza Medical Centre
PO Box 134
200 Bay Street, Suite LR8
Toronto Ontario M5J 2J3
(416) 368-6787
Business Address: 2291 Kipling Avenue
Rexdale Ontario M9W 4L6
(416) 741-4545
Business Address: 245 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 3B7
(416) 488-1455
Business Address: 595 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C2
(416) 598-1703

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Doctors Office
Royal Bank Plaza Medical Centre
PO Box 134
200 Bay St., Unit LR8
Toronto Ontario M5J 2J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 368-6787
Fax: (416) 368-7632
Address: Kipling Heights Medical Centre
2291 Kipling Ave.
Rexdale Ontario M9W 4L6
Phone: 416 741 4545
Fax: 416 744 1484
Address: 1252 Lawrence Avenue East
Victoria Medical Group
Toronto Ontario M3A 1C3
Phone: 416 609 1100
Fax: 416 609 1102
Address: Toronto Health Centre
45 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M4H 1C3
Phone: (416) 696-9836
Extension: 333
Fax: 416 696 8080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 19 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 02 Dec 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Walter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Walter (CPSO#: 52700 )
Business Address: 45 Overlea Boulevard
Suite A6
Toronto Ontario M4H 1C3
(416) 696-9836
Business Address: The Doctors Office
Royal Bank Plaza Medical Centre
PO Box 134
200 Bay Street, Suite LR8
Toronto Ontario M5J 2J3
(416) 368-6787
Business Address: 2291 Kipling Avenue
Rexdale Ontario M9W 4L6
(416) 741-4545
Business Address: 245 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 3B7
(416) 488-1455
Business Address: 595 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C2
(416) 598-1703

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY JOHN WALTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY JOHN WALTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983