THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:13:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 209
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 236-9929
Fax: (613) 236-6801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 23 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Agapitos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Agapitos (CPSO#: 52727 )
Business Address: 209 - 1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1A2
(613) 236-9929

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 209
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 236-9929
Fax: (613) 236-6801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 23 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Agapitos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Agapitos (CPSO#: 52727 )
Business Address: 209 - 1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1A2
(613) 236-9929

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER PANAGIOTIS AGAPITOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGAPITOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER PANAGIOTIS AGAPITOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGAPITOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983