THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:06:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 171 Kendall St
Sarnia ON N7V 4G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193374627
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Chapman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chapman (CPSO#: 52738 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 171 Kendall St
Sarnia ON N7V 4G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193374627
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Chapman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chapman (CPSO#: 52738 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY SUZANNE CHAPMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAPMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY SUZANNE CHAPMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAPMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983