THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 14:30:46 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 21
346 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 623-0311
Fax: (613) 623-4095
Address: 80 McGonigal St W
Renfrew County Virtual Triage Assessment Clinic
Arnprior ON K7S 1M3
Phone: 8447276404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boersma Morrison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Morrison (CPSO#: 52753 ) Dr. J. Boersma (CPSO#: 52780 )
Business Address: Suite 21
346 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
(613) 623-0311

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 21
346 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 623-0311
Fax: (613) 623-4095
Address: 80 McGonigal St W
Renfrew County Virtual Triage Assessment Clinic
Arnprior ON K7S 1M3
Phone: 8447276404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boersma Morrison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Morrison (CPSO#: 52753 ) Dr. J. Boersma (CPSO#: 52780 )
Business Address: Suite 21
346 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
(613) 623-0311

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CYNTHIA MARY MORRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRISON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CYNTHIA MARY MORRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRISON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1983