THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:31:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1
122 Cornell Park Avenue
Markham Ontario L6B 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 471-9999
Fax: (905) 471-3627

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alvarez & Siegel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Siegel (CPSO#: 54756 ) Dr. I. Alvarez (CPSO#: 52754 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(416) 494-2120
Business Address: Suite 1
122 Cornell Park Avenue
Markham Ontario L6B 1B6
(905) 471-9999
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1
122 Cornell Park Avenue
Markham Ontario L6B 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 471-9999
Fax: (905) 471-3627

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alvarez & Siegel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Siegel (CPSO#: 54756 ) Dr. I. Alvarez (CPSO#: 52754 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(416) 494-2120
Business Address: Suite 1
122 Cornell Park Avenue
Markham Ontario L6B 1B6
(905) 471-9999
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ISABEL FRANCES ALVAREZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALVAREZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ISABEL FRANCES ALVAREZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALVAREZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983