THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:58:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Broadway Ave. Suite 105
Toronto ON M4P 1T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-1460
Fax: 416-480-0074

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jack Hakoun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hakoun (CPSO#: 52765 )
Business Address: Suite 105
5 Broadway Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4P 1T7
(416) 480-1460

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Broadway Ave. Suite 105
Toronto ON M4P 1T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-1460
Fax: 416-480-0074

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jack Hakoun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hakoun (CPSO#: 52765 )
Business Address: Suite 105
5 Broadway Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4P 1T7
(416) 480-1460

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACK HAKOUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAKOUN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACK HAKOUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAKOUN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 26 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 1985

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983