THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:24:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Ave.,
Toronto
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710
Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Extension: 6333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 30 Nov 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Rewa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rewa (CPSO#: 52771 )
Business Address: 211 - 688 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3B7
(416) 466-1700
Business Address: Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
(416) 461-2710
Business Address: Toronto Cardiology Associates
837 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 1L2
(416) 465-5464
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6580 Extn: 6333

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Ave.,
Toronto
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710
Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Extension: 6333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 30 Nov 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Rewa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rewa (CPSO#: 52771 )
Business Address: 211 - 688 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3B7
(416) 466-1700
Business Address: Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
(416) 461-2710
Business Address: Toronto Cardiology Associates
837 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 1L2
(416) 465-5464
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6580 Extn: 6333

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE REWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REWA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE REWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REWA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1983
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 1983