THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:33:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital and
Region Imaging Associates
Suite 502
751 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 1J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 02 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ritchie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ritchie (CPSO#: 52781 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital and Region Imaging Associates
502 - 751 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 1J7
(613) 737-8571

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital and
Region Imaging Associates
Suite 502
751 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 1J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 02 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ritchie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ritchie (CPSO#: 52781 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital and Region Imaging Associates
502 - 751 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 1J7
(613) 737-8571

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT GORDON RITCHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RITCHIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT GORDON RITCHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RITCHIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983