THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 09:55:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 23B
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-3510
Fax: (519) 578-6040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Pope Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pope (CPSO#: 52787 )
Business Address: 421 Greenbrook Dr
Kitchener ON N2M 4K1
Business Address: 659 Dundas Street
London Ontario N5W 2Z1
(519) 660-0874

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 23B
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-3510
Fax: (519) 578-6040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Pope Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pope (CPSO#: 52787 )
Business Address: 421 Greenbrook Dr
Kitchener ON N2M 4K1
Business Address: 659 Dundas Street
London Ontario N5W 2Z1
(519) 660-0874

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN DAVID POPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN DAVID POPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1983