THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:06:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2401 Yonge Street
Suite 204
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 485-2222
Fax: (416) 485-2276

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan R. Goldstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Goldstein (CPSO#: 52796 )
Business Address: 204 - 2401 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E7
(416) 485-2222

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2401 Yonge Street
Suite 204
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 485-2222
Fax: (416) 485-2276

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan R. Goldstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Goldstein (CPSO#: 52796 )
Business Address: 204 - 2401 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E7
(416) 485-2222

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN RUTH GOLDSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDSTEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN RUTH GOLDSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983