THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:36:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3530 Derry Rd E,
Mississauga ON L4T 4E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Blvd.
Burlington, ON Burlington
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
Phone: 905-632-3737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: SHSC
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: 416 480 6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 22 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordon Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Cheung (CPSO#: 52884 )
Business Address: 26 Taylorwood Dr
Etobicoke ON M9A 4R7
Business Address: Oxford Advanced Imaging
100 - 10 Kingsbridge Garden Circle
Mississauga Ontario L5R 3K6
(905) 568-3768
Business Address: Sunnybrook and Women's College
Health Sciences Centre
Diagnostic Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4372
Business Address: Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
(905) 632-3730

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3530 Derry Rd E,
Mississauga ON L4T 4E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Blvd.
Burlington, ON Burlington
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
Phone: 905-632-3737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: SHSC
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: 416 480 6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 22 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordon Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Cheung (CPSO#: 52884 )
Business Address: 26 Taylorwood Dr
Etobicoke ON M9A 4R7
Business Address: Oxford Advanced Imaging
100 - 10 Kingsbridge Garden Circle
Mississauga Ontario L5R 3K6
(905) 568-3768
Business Address: Sunnybrook and Women's College
Health Sciences Centre
Diagnostic Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4372
Business Address: Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
(905) 632-3730

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GORDON CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GORDON CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1983