THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:20:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 13 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 1-888-563-3732 Ext. 1
RSRS
111 St. Regis Cres S
North York, ON
M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 18 Nov 2020

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elaine Blacklock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Blacklock (CPSO#: 52886 )
Business Address: 16 Aspenwood Crt
Sudbury ON P3E 5V9
7056655889

Corporation Name: Dr. Elaine Blacklock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jan 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 13 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 1-888-563-3732 Ext. 1
RSRS
111 St. Regis Cres S
North York, ON
M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 18 Nov 2020

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elaine Blacklock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Blacklock (CPSO#: 52886 )
Business Address: 16 Aspenwood Crt
Sudbury ON P3E 5V9
7056655889

Corporation Name: Dr. Elaine Blacklock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jan 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELAINE GLORIA BLACKLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACKLOCK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELAINE GLORIA BLACKLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACKLOCK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 1994

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1983