THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/04/25 23:44:39 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 1Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-759-1234
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sault Area Hospitals
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 2C4
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark W. Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Edwards (CPSO#: 52889 )
Business Address: 240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 1Y5
(705) 759-1234
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
(705) 759-3434
Business Address: 773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 5K7
(705) 759-1234

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 1Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-759-1234
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sault Area Hospitals
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 2C4
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark W. Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Edwards (CPSO#: 52889 )
Business Address: 240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 1Y5
(705) 759-1234
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
(705) 759-3434
Business Address: 773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 5K7
(705) 759-1234

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK WILLIAM EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK WILLIAM EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 May 1987

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1983