THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:25:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
West Wing 4-431
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-6200
Fax: (416) 603-5298

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 20 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lozano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lozano (CPSO#: 52912 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing 4th Floor - 431
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-6200

Corporation Name: Massicotte Tymianski Gentili Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Oct 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
West Wing 4-431
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-6200
Fax: (416) 603-5298

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 20 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lozano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lozano (CPSO#: 52912 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing 4th Floor - 431
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-6200

Corporation Name: Massicotte Tymianski Gentili Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Oct 2016

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRES LOZANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOZANO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRES LOZANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOZANO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983