THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:29:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Regional HC
201 Georgian Dr.
Barrie On.
L4M 6M2
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-728-9802
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Law Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Law
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geoffrey Bond Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bond (CPSO#: 52913 )
Business Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9802

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Regional HC
201 Georgian Dr.
Barrie On.
L4M 6M2
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-728-9802
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Law Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Law
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geoffrey Bond Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bond (CPSO#: 52913 )
Business Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9802

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEOFFREY HUBERT BOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEOFFREY HUBERT BOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983