THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:29:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
Verspeeten Family Cancer Centre (Formerly London Regional Cancer Program)
Department of Radiation Oncology
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8650
Extension: 53019
Fax: 519-685-8627

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 17 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. E. Perera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Perera (CPSO#: 52923 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
Verspeeten Family Cancer Centre (Formerly London Regional Cancer Program)
Department of Radiation Oncology
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8650
Extension: 53019
Fax: 519-685-8627

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 17 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. E. Perera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Perera (CPSO#: 52923 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCISCO ELMER PERERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERERA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCISCO ELMER PERERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERERA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983