THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:00:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 3483
Fax: (613) 548-1375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 24 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Ho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ho (CPSO#: 52926 )
Business Address: 1245 Greenwood Park Dr
Kingston ON K7K 0E1

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jan 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 3483
Fax: (613) 548-1375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 24 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Ho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ho (CPSO#: 52926 )
Business Address: 1245 Greenwood Park Dr
Kingston ON K7K 0E1

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jan 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY MING HEI HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY MING HEI HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983