THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:40:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250 Wyecroft Road
Unit 18
Oakville Ontario L6K 3T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 849-7220
Fax: (905) 849-7238

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 23 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deakon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Deakon (CPSO#: 52946 )
Business Address: 18 - 250 Wyecroft Road
Oakville Ontario L6K 3T7
(905) 849-7220

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250 Wyecroft Road
Unit 18
Oakville Ontario L6K 3T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 849-7220
Fax: (905) 849-7238

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 23 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deakon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Deakon (CPSO#: 52946 )
Business Address: 18 - 250 Wyecroft Road
Oakville Ontario L6K 3T7
(905) 849-7220

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT TIMOTHY DEAKON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEAKON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT TIMOTHY DEAKON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEAKON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983