THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:29:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hopital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 895 March Road
Kanata Ontario K2K1X7
Phone: 6135911099
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 18 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.C. Cawadias Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cawadias (CPSO#: 52977 )
Business Address: Hopital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: 895 March Road
Kanata Ontario K2K 1X7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hopital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 895 March Road
Kanata Ontario K2K1X7
Phone: 6135911099
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 18 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.C. Cawadias Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cawadias (CPSO#: 52977 )
Business Address: Hopital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: 895 March Road
Kanata Ontario K2K 1X7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER CONSTANTINE CAWADIAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAWADIAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER CONSTANTINE CAWADIAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAWADIAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983