THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 17:00:50 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health Systems
St.Catharines General Hospital
1200 4th Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 684-7271
Extension: 45561
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CRTCE
1100 Dundas Sr. West
unit 6
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4E7
Phone: 416 943 6284
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Plastic Surgery Clinic
1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5G 3H5
Phone: 905 278 7077
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Corporate Park Dr.
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 3W2
Phone: 905 704 1449
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 21 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Witold Szpejda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Szpejda (CPSO#: 53002 )
Business Address: CRTCE
1100 Dundas St. W.
Mississauga Ontario L6C 4E7
(416) 943-6284
Business Address: Niagara Health Systems
St. Catharine's General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 684-7271 Extn: 45561
Business Address: The Plastic Surgery Clinic
1421 Hurontario St.
Mississauga Ontario L5G 3H7
(905) 278-7077
Business Address: St. Catharines Dental Implants @ Oral Surgery
75 Corporate Park Dr
St Catharines ON L2S 3W2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health Systems
St.Catharines General Hospital
1200 4th Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 684-7271
Extension: 45561
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CRTCE
1100 Dundas Sr. West
unit 6
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4E7
Phone: 416 943 6284
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Plastic Surgery Clinic
1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5G 3H5
Phone: 905 278 7077
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Corporate Park Dr.
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 3W2
Phone: 905 704 1449
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 21 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Witold Szpejda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Szpejda (CPSO#: 53002 )
Business Address: CRTCE
1100 Dundas St. W.
Mississauga Ontario L6C 4E7
(416) 943-6284
Business Address: Niagara Health Systems
St. Catharine's General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 684-7271 Extn: 45561
Business Address: The Plastic Surgery Clinic
1421 Hurontario St.
Mississauga Ontario L5G 3H7
(905) 278-7077
Business Address: St. Catharines Dental Implants @ Oral Surgery
75 Corporate Park Dr
St Catharines ON L2S 3W2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WITOLD JOZEF SZPEJDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZPEJDA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WITOLD JOZEF SZPEJDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZPEJDA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 1985

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983