THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:15:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 103-614 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Medical Imaging
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 740 1790
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 15 Westney Rd N
Westney Heights Diagnostic
Ajax ON L1T 1P4
Phone: 9056869729
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Hatt St
Dundas Medical Imaging
Dundas ON L9H 7T6
Phone: 905 627 4625
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 86 Angeline St S
Lindsay Ultrasound and Xray
Lindsay ON K9V 6C5
Phone: (705) 324-0101
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
MyHealth Centre
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 828-0654
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 660 Eglinton Avenue West
Physician Diagnostic Imaging Centre
Unit 5C
Mississauga Ontario L5R 3V2
Phone: 905 206 1300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 247 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa Diagnostic and Vascular Imaging
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4T5
Phone: 905-438-0555
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 707 Charlotte St
Peterborough ON K9J 7B3
Phone: 705 743 6222
Fax: No Information Available
Address: A-2805 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON M1J 2E1
Phone: (416) 977-2548
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 589 Lake Street
Barclay Diagnostic Imaging
St. Catharines Ontario L2N 7L6
Phone: 905-934-3838
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 12 Morgan Ave
Healthwise Diagnostics
Thornhill Ontario L3T 1R1
Phone: 905 695 5665
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 223-3447 Kennedy Road
Taigu Xray and Ultrasound
Toronto Ontario M1V 3S1
Phone: (416) 299-3443
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 99 Firvalley Court
Warden Woods Xray and Ultrasound
Toronto Ontario M1L 1P2
Phone: 416-699-6222
Fax: 416-694-7401
Address: A-911 Jane St
New Jane Medical Center
York ON M6N 4C6
Phone: 4165274224
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 02 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Barsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Barsky (CPSO#: 53029 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-3978

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 103-614 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Medical Imaging
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 740 1790
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 15 Westney Rd N
Westney Heights Diagnostic
Ajax ON L1T 1P4
Phone: 9056869729
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Hatt St
Dundas Medical Imaging
Dundas ON L9H 7T6
Phone: 905 627 4625
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 86 Angeline St S
Lindsay Ultrasound and Xray
Lindsay ON K9V 6C5
Phone: (705) 324-0101
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
MyHealth Centre
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 828-0654
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 660 Eglinton Avenue West
Physician Diagnostic Imaging Centre
Unit 5C
Mississauga Ontario L5R 3V2
Phone: 905 206 1300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 247 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa Diagnostic and Vascular Imaging
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4T5
Phone: 905-438-0555
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 707 Charlotte St
Peterborough ON K9J 7B3
Phone: 705 743 6222
Fax: No Information Available
Address: A-2805 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON M1J 2E1
Phone: (416) 977-2548
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 589 Lake Street
Barclay Diagnostic Imaging
St. Catharines Ontario L2N 7L6
Phone: 905-934-3838
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 12 Morgan Ave
Healthwise Diagnostics
Thornhill Ontario L3T 1R1
Phone: 905 695 5665
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 223-3447 Kennedy Road
Taigu Xray and Ultrasound
Toronto Ontario M1V 3S1
Phone: (416) 299-3443
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 99 Firvalley Court
Warden Woods Xray and Ultrasound
Toronto Ontario M1L 1P2
Phone: 416-699-6222
Fax: 416-694-7401
Address: A-911 Jane St
New Jane Medical Center
York ON M6N 4C6
Phone: 4165274224
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 02 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Barsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Barsky (CPSO#: 53029 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-3978

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL FREDERICK BARSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARSKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL FREDERICK BARSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARSKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983