THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:06:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie Street
North York General Hospital
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 416-756-6517
Fax: 416-756-4294

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 14 Dec 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sandip K. SenGupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sen Gupta (CPSO#: 53047 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie Street
North York General Hospital
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 416-756-6517
Fax: 416-756-4294

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 14 Dec 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sandip K. SenGupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sen Gupta (CPSO#: 53047 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDIP KUMAR SEN GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEN GUPTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDIP KUMAR SEN GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEN GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983