THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:02:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UNIT 7
3434 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1H 1A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 289-1225
Fax: (416) 289-0970
Address: SCARBOROUGH HEALTH NETWORK
GENERAL Campus
3030 Lawrence Ave. EAST
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-431-8200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Scarborough Health Network
BIRCHMOUNT Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: 416-431-8200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: ROUGE VALLEY HOSPITAL (CENTENNARY)
2867 ELLESMERE RD.
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7103
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 11 Sep 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Shahin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shahin (CPSO#: 53161 )
Business Address: 7 - 3434 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1H 1A9
(416) 289-1225

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UNIT 7
3434 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1H 1A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 289-1225
Fax: (416) 289-0970
Address: SCARBOROUGH HEALTH NETWORK
GENERAL Campus
3030 Lawrence Ave. EAST
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-431-8200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Scarborough Health Network
BIRCHMOUNT Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: 416-431-8200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: ROUGE VALLEY HOSPITAL (CENTENNARY)
2867 ELLESMERE RD.
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7103
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 11 Sep 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Shahin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shahin (CPSO#: 53161 )
Business Address: 7 - 3434 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1H 1A9
(416) 289-1225

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACK SHAHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACK SHAHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983