THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:24:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Iceland, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ICELANDIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (416) 480-5847
Fax: (416) 480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 08 Sep 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.A. Bjarnason Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bjarnason (CPSO#: 53164 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Room T2-049
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-5847

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ICELANDIC
Medical School: University of Iceland, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (416) 480-5847
Fax: (416) 480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 08 Sep 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.A. Bjarnason Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bjarnason (CPSO#: 53164 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Room T2-049
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-5847

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORG ARNOLD BJARNASON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BJARNASON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORG ARNOLD BJARNASON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BJARNASON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Iceland, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983