THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:35:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department Of Anesthesiology
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: 613 548-1375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joel Parlow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Parlow (CPSO#: 53229 )
Business Address: Providence Care
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
(613) 546-4900
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-7827

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jan 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department Of Anesthesiology
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: 613 548-1375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joel Parlow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Parlow (CPSO#: 53229 )
Business Address: Providence Care
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
(613) 546-4900
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-7827

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jan 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEL LEONARD PARLOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARLOW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEL LEONARD PARLOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARLOW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983