THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:09:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5400 Portage Road
Suite 401
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 5X7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 357-2423
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chander Bhagirath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bhagirath (CPSO#: 53301 )
Business Address: 401 - 5400 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 5X7
(905) 357-2423

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5400 Portage Road
Suite 401
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 5X7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 357-2423
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chander Bhagirath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bhagirath (CPSO#: 53301 )
Business Address: 401 - 5400 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 5X7
(905) 357-2423

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHANDER PARVESH BHAGIRATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAGIRATH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHANDER PARVESH BHAGIRATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAGIRATH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983