THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:50:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Siani Fertility
Mount Sinai Hospital
7th Floor
250 Dundas Street West
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-5046
Fax: (416) 586-4686

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ellen M. Greenblatt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Greenblatt (CPSO#: 53333 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
3rd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-5046
Business Address: 250 Dundas Street West
7th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 2Z8
(416) 586-5046

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Siani Fertility
Mount Sinai Hospital
7th Floor
250 Dundas Street West
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-5046
Fax: (416) 586-4686

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ellen M. Greenblatt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Greenblatt (CPSO#: 53333 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
3rd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-5046
Business Address: 250 Dundas Street West
7th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 2Z8
(416) 586-5046

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLEN MARY GREENBLATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENBLATT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLEN MARY GREENBLATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENBLATT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1983