THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:42:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1371 Neilson Road
Suite 201
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 282-9198
Fax: (416) 282-9897

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 27 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 06 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
North York General Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. G. Beaulieu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Beaulieu (CPSO#: 53344 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1371 Neilson Road
Suite 201
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 282-9198
Fax: (416) 282-9897

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 27 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 06 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
North York General Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. G. Beaulieu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Beaulieu (CPSO#: 53344 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROLAND GEORGE BEAULIEU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAULIEU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROLAND GEORGE BEAULIEU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAULIEU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1983