THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 07:07:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104-305 Milner Ave
Scarborough ON M1B 3V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-724-7774
Fax: 416-724-7752
Address: GTA Endoscopy
Suite 920
305 Milner Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1B 3V4
Phone: (416) 321-3883
Fax: (416) 321-5162

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 16 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naresh Mohan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mohan (CPSO#: 53394 )
Business Address: 104-305 Milner Ave
Scarborough ON M1B 3V4

Corporation Name: Naresh Mohan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104-305 Milner Ave
Scarborough ON M1B 3V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-724-7774
Fax: 416-724-7752
Address: GTA Endoscopy
Suite 920
305 Milner Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1B 3V4
Phone: (416) 321-3883
Fax: (416) 321-5162

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 16 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naresh Mohan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mohan (CPSO#: 53394 )
Business Address: 104-305 Milner Ave
Scarborough ON M1B 3V4

Corporation Name: Naresh Mohan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NARESH MOHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NARESH MOHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 1989

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1983