THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 02:57:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Haiti, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CREOLE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 311 McArthur Avenue
Suite 108
Ottawa Ontario K1L 8M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4845
Fax: (613) 746-7017
Address: 75 Bruyere St
Geriatry pschiatry community
services of Ottawa
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C7
Phone: 613 562 0283
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ottawa Hospital- Geriatric
Psychiatry Community Services
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: 613 746 4845
Fax: 613 746 7017

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec
Haiti
USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall General Hospital Cornwall
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Cornwall General Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Bazile Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Bazile (CPSO#: 53445 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CREOLE
Medical School: University of Haiti, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 311 McArthur Avenue
Suite 108
Ottawa Ontario K1L 8M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4845
Fax: (613) 746-7017
Address: 75 Bruyere St
Geriatry pschiatry community
services of Ottawa
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C7
Phone: 613 562 0283
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ottawa Hospital- Geriatric
Psychiatry Community Services
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: 613 746 4845
Fax: 613 746 7017

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec
Haiti
USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall General Hospital Cornwall
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Cornwall General Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Bazile Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Bazile (CPSO#: 53445 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILIO BAZILE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAZILE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILIO BAZILE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAZILE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Haiti, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 1983