THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:28:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 29 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Blair Fearon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fearon (CPSO#: 53467 ) Dr. S. Fearon (CPSO#: 52993 )
Business Address: 178 Ellerslie Ave
North York ON M2N 1Y4
4162786121

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 29 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Blair Fearon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fearon (CPSO#: 53467 ) Dr. S. Fearon (CPSO#: 52993 )
Business Address: 178 Ellerslie Ave
North York ON M2N 1Y4
4162786121

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 25 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 1983