THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:13:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department Of Emergency Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 79002
Fax: (613) 737-8967

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Weitzman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Weitzman (CPSO#: 53593 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital - General Site
Emergency Department
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 79002

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department Of Emergency Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 79002
Fax: (613) 737-8967

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Weitzman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Weitzman (CPSO#: 53593 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital - General Site
Emergency Department
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 79002

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN NEIL WEITZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEITZMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN NEIL WEITZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEITZMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1983
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 1983