THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:47:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
210 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 968-3543
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryan Sloan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Sep 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sloan (CPSO#: 53604 )
Business Address: Suite 208
210 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5G8
(613) 968-3543

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
210 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 968-3543
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryan Sloan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Sep 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sloan (CPSO#: 53604 )
Business Address: Suite 208
210 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5G8
(613) 968-3543

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN WESLEY SLOAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLOAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN WESLEY SLOAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLOAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Feb 2017
Summary:
Effective September 7, 2018, Dr. Ryan Wesley Sloan has completed all components of his SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Feb 2017
Summary:
Effective September 7, 2018, Dr. Ryan Wesley Sloan has completed all components of his SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1983
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 1983