THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:28:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1967
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 230A - 100 Collip Circle
London Ontario N6G 4X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 858-5086
Fax: (519) 858-5086
Address: St Joseph's Family Medical Centre
346 Platts Lane
London Ontario N6G 1J1
Phone: (519) 672-9660
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 230A
100 Collip Circle
London Ontario N6G 4X8
Phone: (519) 858-5085
Extension: 25085
Fax: (519) 858-5086
Address: Fowler Kennedy Clinic
Fanshawe College
1001 Fanshawe College Boulevard
London Ontario N5Y 5R6
Phone: (519) 452-4230
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Mar 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 17 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Robert Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Campbell (CPSO#: 53643 )
Business Address: 19 Carnforth Road
London Ontario N6G 4R2

Corporation Name: David Robert Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Nov 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 230A - 100 Collip Circle
London Ontario N6G 4X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 858-5086
Fax: (519) 858-5086
Address: St Joseph's Family Medical Centre
346 Platts Lane
London Ontario N6G 1J1
Phone: (519) 672-9660
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 230A
100 Collip Circle
London Ontario N6G 4X8
Phone: (519) 858-5085
Extension: 25085
Fax: (519) 858-5086
Address: Fowler Kennedy Clinic
Fanshawe College
1001 Fanshawe College Boulevard
London Ontario N5Y 5R6
Phone: (519) 452-4230
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Mar 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 17 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Robert Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Campbell (CPSO#: 53643 )
Business Address: 19 Carnforth Road
London Ontario N6G 4R2

Corporation Name: David Robert Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Nov 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ROBERT CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ROBERT CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1967

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1983
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 1983