THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:50:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Milton Lifecare Clinic 100 Bronte St. S.
Milton Ontario L9T 1Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 878-6868
Fax: (905) 878-2992
Address: Mens Addiction Services Hamilton
595 Main Street E.
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1J4
Phone: 905-527-9264
Fax: 905-527-2661
Address: 200 Main St E
Lower
Hamilton ON L8N 1H3
Phone: (905) 523-4567
Fax: (905) 523-4533

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adrian Rocci Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rocci (CPSO#: 53710 )
Business Address: 595 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1J4
(905) 527-9264
Business Address: 100 Bronte Street South
Suite 1
Milton Ontario L9T 1Y8
Business Address: 200 Main Street East Lower
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1H3
(905) 523-6333

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Milton Lifecare Clinic 100 Bronte St. S.
Milton Ontario L9T 1Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 878-6868
Fax: (905) 878-2992
Address: Mens Addiction Services Hamilton
595 Main Street E.
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1J4
Phone: 905-527-9264
Fax: 905-527-2661
Address: 200 Main St E
Lower
Hamilton ON L8N 1H3
Phone: (905) 523-4567
Fax: (905) 523-4533

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adrian Rocci Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rocci (CPSO#: 53710 )
Business Address: 595 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1J4
(905) 527-9264
Business Address: 100 Bronte Street South
Suite 1
Milton Ontario L9T 1Y8
Business Address: 200 Main Street East Lower
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1H3
(905) 523-6333

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIANO ROCCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCCI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIANO ROCCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCCI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Mar 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 1984

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 1984