THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:30:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Mysore, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Maclean Place
Suite 3-4
Welland Ontario L3B 5X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 735-8011
Fax: (905) 735-8014

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 16 Nov 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Kumaran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kumaran (CPSO#: 53734 )
Business Address: Suite 3-4
115 Maclean Place
Welland Ontario L3B 5X9
(905) 735-8011

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM
Medical School: University of Mysore, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Maclean Place
Suite 3-4
Welland Ontario L3B 5X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 735-8011
Fax: (905) 735-8014

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 16 Nov 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Kumaran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kumaran (CPSO#: 53734 )
Business Address: Suite 3-4
115 Maclean Place
Welland Ontario L3B 5X9
(905) 735-8011

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAGHUNATH KUMARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMARAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAGHUNATH KUMARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMARAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Mysore, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 1984