THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:11:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Extension: 4525
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Rhodes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Rhodes (CPSO#: 53828 )
Business Address: Monfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621 Extn: 4525

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Extension: 4525
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Rhodes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Rhodes (CPSO#: 53828 )
Business Address: Monfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621 Extn: 4525

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN NELSON RHODES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RHODES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN NELSON RHODES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RHODES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1984