THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:49:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-855-629-0365
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Oct 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 30 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Keith Ferguson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Ferguson (CPSO#: 53840 )
Business Address: Strathroy Medical Clinic
74 Front Street East
Strathroy Ontario N7G 1Y7
(519) 246-0430
Business Address: 21 Queensway West
Rapid Access Clinic
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
18556290365

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-855-629-0365
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Oct 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 30 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Keith Ferguson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Ferguson (CPSO#: 53840 )
Business Address: Strathroy Medical Clinic
74 Front Street East
Strathroy Ontario N7G 1Y7
(519) 246-0430
Business Address: 21 Queensway West
Rapid Access Clinic
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
18556290365

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN KEITH FERGUSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERGUSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN KEITH FERGUSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERGUSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1984