THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:34:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
4SE Room 106
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6517
Fax: (416) 756-4294

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 31 May 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simon J. Raphael Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Raphael (CPSO#: 53863 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Room 4SE106
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6517

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
4SE Room 106
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6517
Fax: (416) 756-4294

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 31 May 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simon J. Raphael Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Raphael (CPSO#: 53863 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Room 4SE106
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6517

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIMON JONATHAN RAPHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPHAEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIMON JONATHAN RAPHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPHAEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984