THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:17:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 274 Dundas Street East
Suite 201
Belleville Ontario K8N 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-8087
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 22 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. David Birchard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Birchard (CPSO#: 53864 )
Business Address: 201 - 274 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 1E6
(613) 969-8087

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 274 Dundas Street East
Suite 201
Belleville Ontario K8N 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-8087
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 22 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. David Birchard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Birchard (CPSO#: 53864 )
Business Address: 201 - 274 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 1E6
(613) 969-8087

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES DAVID BIRCHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIRCHARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES DAVID BIRCHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIRCHARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984