THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:08:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 300
581 Argus Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 3J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-9900
Fax: (905) 338-9904

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony McDowell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. McDowell (CPSO#: 53870 )
Business Address: 281 Reynolds Street
Oakville Ontario L6J 3L5
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Address: 203 Georgian Drive
Oakville Ontario L6H 7H9
Business Address: 300 - 581 Argus Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 3J4
(905) 338-9900
Business Address: 345 Church Street
Oakville Ontario L6J 7G4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 300
581 Argus Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 3J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-9900
Fax: (905) 338-9904

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony McDowell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. McDowell (CPSO#: 53870 )
Business Address: 281 Reynolds Street
Oakville Ontario L6J 3L5
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Address: 203 Georgian Drive
Oakville Ontario L6H 7H9
Business Address: 300 - 581 Argus Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 3J4
(905) 338-9900
Business Address: 345 Church Street
Oakville Ontario L6J 7G4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY DOUGLAS MCDOWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDOWELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY DOUGLAS MCDOWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDOWELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984