THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:16:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Avenue
A280
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4766
Fax: (613) 761-5362

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 20 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 20 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George Hajjar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Hajjar (CPSO#: 53875 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
A280 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 783-1641

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Avenue
A280
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4766
Fax: (613) 761-5362

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 20 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 20 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George Hajjar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Hajjar (CPSO#: 53875 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
A280 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 783-1641

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE HAJJAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJJAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE HAJJAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJJAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 May 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984