THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:08:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 535 Belmont Avenue West
535 Belmont Ave West
Suite 204
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5195739140
Fax: 5193401440

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 May 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gillian Oliver Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Oliver (CPSO#: 53882 )
Business Address: 201-535 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E9
(519) 744-0800
Business Address: 11 Huntley Crescent
Kitchener Ontario N2M 2R4
5196351203

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 535 Belmont Avenue West
535 Belmont Ave West
Suite 204
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5195739140
Fax: 5193401440

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 May 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gillian Oliver Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Oliver (CPSO#: 53882 )
Business Address: 201-535 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E9
(519) 744-0800
Business Address: 11 Huntley Crescent
Kitchener Ontario N2M 2R4
5196351203

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GILLIAN DENIZE OLIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GILLIAN DENIZE OLIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1984