THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:28:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Mary's Regional Cardiac Care Ctr
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749 6946
Fax: (519) 749-6677

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 04 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 24 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 26 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Kassem Ashe Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ashe (CPSO#: 53888 )
Business Address: 2373 Robmar Drive
Oakville Ontario L6H 0B2
5195919944

Corporation Name: Dr Kassem Ashe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 May 2023

Corporation Name: Dr. Kassem Ashe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Mary's Regional Cardiac Care Ctr
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749 6946
Fax: (519) 749-6677

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 04 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 24 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 26 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Kassem Ashe Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ashe (CPSO#: 53888 )
Business Address: 2373 Robmar Drive
Oakville Ontario L6H 0B2
5195919944

Corporation Name: Dr Kassem Ashe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 May 2023

Corporation Name: Dr. Kassem Ashe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KASSEM ALI ASHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KASSEM ALI ASHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984