THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:08:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-6100
Extension: 2363
Fax: 416-480-6032

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 May 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Pugash Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pugash (CPSO#: 53910 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
MG 189 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6197

Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jul 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-6100
Extension: 2363
Fax: 416-480-6032

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 May 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Pugash Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pugash (CPSO#: 53910 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
MG 189 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6197

Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jul 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBYN ANNE PUGASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUGASH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBYN ANNE PUGASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUGASH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984