THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:23:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Courtice Health Centre
Suite DI
1450 Highway #2
Courtice Ontario L1E 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 721-4932
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
DI
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: 9055768711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 May 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lori Moore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Moore (CPSO#: 53977 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Courtice Health Centre
Suite DI
1450 Highway #2
Courtice Ontario L1E 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 721-4932
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
DI
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: 9055768711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 May 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lori Moore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Moore (CPSO#: 53977 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORI ANN MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORI ANN MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984