THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:23:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 44 Main St. E.
Chelmsford Ontario P0M 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 855-5099
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Merotto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Merotto (CPSO#: 53978 )
Business Address: 865 Regent Street South
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
(705) 671-1000
Business Address: 44 Main Street East
Chelmsford Ontario P0M 1L0
(705) 855-5099

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 44 Main St. E.
Chelmsford Ontario P0M 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 855-5099
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Merotto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Merotto (CPSO#: 53978 )
Business Address: 865 Regent Street South
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
(705) 671-1000
Business Address: 44 Main Street East
Chelmsford Ontario P0M 1L0
(705) 855-5099

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT ANGELO MEROTTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEROTTO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT ANGELO MEROTTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEROTTO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984